Thomas Herbst
Department's board of directors (Membership)
01.10.2007 - 30.09.2009
Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2006 - 30.09.2008
Rudolf Freiburg
Senat (Membership)
01.01.2004 - 31.12.2007
Mechthild Habermann
Faculty Management Board (Presidency)
01.04.2006 - 30.09.2007
Simone Broders
Interdisziplinary Center (Member)
07.01.2007
Dirk Niefanger
01.01.2007
Thomas Herbst
Speaker of the Faculty
01.10.2004 - 30.09.2006
Christine Lubkoll-Klotz
Speaker of SFB, GRK or elite program
01.04.2006
Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.04.2006
Mechthild Habermann
Faculty Management Board (Membership)
01.10.2004 - 31.03.2006