Kathrin Möslein
01.04.2007 - 31.03.2012
Roland Sturm
Board of the Faculty (Membership)
01.01.2012
Malte Kaspereit
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.09.2011
Malte Kaspereit
Working group coordinator
01.09.2011
Jürgen van Oorschot
Management Board / Speaker of a FAU-Central Institute
01.01.2011
Thomas Fischer
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2010
Thomas Fischer
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2010
Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Presidency)
01.10.2008 - 30.09.2010
Kathrin Möslein
01.09.2010
Stefan Schierholz
01.01.2010