Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2013
Michael Wensing
Faculty Management Board (Membership)
01.10.2010 - 30.09.2013
Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Presidency)
01.10.2010 - 30.09.2013
Svenja Hagenhoff
Appointment Committee (Member)
01.11.2012 - 31.08.2013
Gerhard Ernst
Special Representative
01.01.2013
Peter Dabrock
Commission for Ethical Issues (Membership)
01.01.2013
Werner Wilhelm Schnabel
17.12.2012
Thomas Fischer
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2012
Gerhard Ernst
Central Board on Disposition of the Tuition Fees
01.04.2012
Gerhard Ernst
Speaker of the Faculty
01.04.2012