Stephanie Evert
Interdisziplinary Center (Member)
18.11.2014
Richard Lenz
Faculty Management Board (Membership)
01.10.2011 - 30.09.2014
Svenja Hagenhoff
Appointment Committee (Presidency)
01.11.2013 - 31.07.2014
Stephanie Evert
Interdisziplinary Center (Member)
24.04.2014
Thorsten Uthmeier
Department's board of directors (Membership)
01.10.2013 - 01.04.2014
Doris Feldmann
01.10.2011 - 31.03.2014
Rudolf Freiburg
Interdisziplinary Center (Member)
01.01.2014
Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2013
Michael Wensing
Commission on Study & Teaching (Membership)
01.10.2013
Christine Lubkoll-Klotz
01.10.2013